Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Joseph Dantin, M.S. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Antsirabé, Madagascar

Titular Bishop of Satala in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1870Born
30 May 189626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
24 Jun 191343.3AppointedPrefect of Betafó, Madagascar
24 Aug 191848.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Betafó, Madagascar
10 Sep 191848.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Satala in Armenia
5 Aug 191949.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Satala in Armenia
5 Jul 194171.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Antsirabé, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for François-Joseph Dantin
Bishop François-Joseph Dantin M.S. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Antsirabé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMeyrieux-Trouet, France

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast