Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zacharie de Metz

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission)

Titular Bishop of Tralles in Asia


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Feb 1656AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands
22 Feb 1656AppointedTitular Bishop of Tralles in Asia
12 Mar 1656Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tralles in Asia
13 Jul 1661DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Zacharie de Metz
Bishop Zacharie de Metz (died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission)

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 341
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 4
  • ob/c2: CB, 6 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016