Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo D’Addario

Deceased

Bishop of Teramo-Atri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1942BornPianella
26 Jun 196624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Penne e Pescara, Italy
17 Apr 198643.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
5 Jun 198644.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
16 Apr 198744.9SucceededBishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy
2 Jun 199048.1AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia-Vieste, Italy
24 Aug 200260.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Teramo-Atri, Italy
1 Dec 200563.6DiedBishop of Teramo-Atri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo D’Addario:
Archbishop Vincenzo D’Addario (born , died ) Bishop of Teramo-Atri

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,238
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013