Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Daniel Cyrille

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

Titular Bishop of Anastasiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1831Born
5 May 185624.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Oct 189362.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
16 Oct 189362.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
2 May 189462.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
12 Nov 191685.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Paul Daniel Cyrille
Bishop Paul Daniel Cyrille (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMossoul

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1894, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017