Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Emmanuel de Cugnac

Deceased

Bishop of Lectoure, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1729¹Born
7 Jul 177243.5SelectedBishop of Lectoure, France
7 Sep 177243.6ConfirmedBishop of Lectoure, France
27 Sep 177243.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lectoure, France
8 Dec 180071.9DiedBishop of Lectoure, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Emmanuel de Cugnac
Bishop Louis-Emmanuel de Cugnac (born 1729, died ) Bishop of Lectoure

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCahors, Diocese of Cahors

  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 256

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast