Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Franz Johann Bertrand von Nesselrode

Deceased

Bishop of Pécs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1652³BornDusseldorf
19 Apr 170350.8SelectedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
21 Jul 171058.0ConfirmedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
27 Sep 171159.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pécs, Hungary
29 Sep 173280.2DiedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Franz Johann Bertrand von Nesselrode:
Bishop Wilhelm Franz Johann Bertrand von Nesselrode (born , died ) Bishop of Pécs

  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 326
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015