Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Alfonso Crespo Chiriboga

Deceased

Bishop of Loja


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1907BornZozuma
192720.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Nov 196356.8AppointedBishop of Loja, Ecuador
8 Dec 196356.9Ordained BishopBishop of Loja, Ecuador
21 Sep 197265.7DiedBishop of Loja, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Luis Alfonso Crespo Chiriboga:
Bishop Luis Alfonso Crespo Chiriboga (died ) Bishop of Loja

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013