Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Volumnio Cardinal Bandinelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1598²BornSiena, Italy
29 Apr 165860.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
3 Jun 165860.4AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
10 Jun 165860.4Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
5 Apr 166062.3Elevated to Cardinal
19 Apr 166062.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
5 Jun 166769.4DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Volumnio Bandinelli:
Cardinal Volumnio Bandinelli (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
  • a cardinal for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Apr 1658
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 120, Number 733
  • Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013