Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Strozzi

Deceased

Bishop of Arezzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1631BornFlorentin
8 Mar 167746.2AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
20 Mar 167746.2Ordained BishopBishop of Arezzo, Italy
19 Oct 168251.8DiedBishop of Arezzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Strozzi:
Bishop Alessandro Strozzi (died ) Bishop of Arezzo

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013