Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph Marie Anthony Cardinal Cordeiro

Deceased

Archbishop of Karachi

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Andrea delle Fratte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1918BornBombay, India
24 Aug 194628.5Ordained PriestPriest of Karachi, Pakistan
7 May 195840.3AppointedArchbishop of Karachi, Pakistan
24 Aug 195840.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Karachi, Pakistan
5 Mar 197355.1Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197355.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Andrea delle Fratte
11 Feb 199476.0DiedArchbishop of Karachi, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Joseph Marie Anthony Cordeiro:
Joseph Marie Anthony Cardinal Cordeiro (born , died ) Archbishop of Karachi

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
  • a cardinal for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015