Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph

Deceased

Bishop of Faisalabad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1932BornKhuspur
18 Jan 196027.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lyallpur, Pakistan
24 Oct 198047.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Faisalabad, Pakistan
24 Oct 198047.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Segisama
9 Jan 198148.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Segisama
9 Jan 198451.2AppointedBishop of Faisalabad, Pakistan
6 May 199865.5DiedBishop of Faisalabad, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for John Joseph:
Bishop John Joseph (born , died ) Bishop of Faisalabad

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013