Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Batignani

Deceased

Bishop of Montepulciano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1856Born
21 Dec 187822.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 189842.6AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
4 Dec 189842.7Ordained BishopBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
4 Feb 193376.8DiedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Batignani (VIAF: 88818637)
Bishop Giuseppe Batignani (born , died ) Bishop of Montepulciano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuonconvento, Archdiocese of Siena
Ordained BishopSantissime Stimmate di San Francesco, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 394
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017