Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Ciceri, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nanking [Nanjing]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1639BornComo, Italy
165616.5ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
3 Oct 169354.3SelectedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
25 Jan 169454.6ConfirmedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
5 Feb 169656.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
22 Dec 170364.5DiedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Ciceri:
Bishop Alessandro Ciceri S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Nanking [Nanjing]

  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015