Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef František Hurdalek

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Litoměřice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1747BornNáchode
25 May 177123.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Sep 177123.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 181567.6SelectedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
18 Dec 181568.1ConfirmedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
18 Feb 181668.3Ordained BishopBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
18 Dec 182275.1RetiredBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
27 Dec 183386.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Josef František Hurdalek:
Bishop Josef František Hurdalek (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Litoměřice

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013