Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Francis Egan, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1761³BornIreland
1785¹23.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
8 Apr 180846.5AppointedBishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
28 Oct 181049.1Ordained BishopBishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
22 Jul 181452.8DiedBishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Francis Egan:
Bishop Michael Francis Egan O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Philadelphia

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 305

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013