Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leonard Neale

Deceased

Archbishop of Baltimore, Maryland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1746BornPort Tobacco, MD
7 Sep 176720.8ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
5 Jun 177326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
21 Jul 177326.7IncardinatedPriest of United States of America
17 Apr 179548.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
17 Apr 179548.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gortyna
7 Dec 180054.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gortyna
3 Dec 181569.1SucceededArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
18 Jun 181770.6DiedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary for Leonard Neale:
Archbishop Leonard Neale (born , died ) Archbishop of Baltimore

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 21
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 17 Aug 2015