Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Michel-Marie Double

Deceased

Bishop of Tarbes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1767BornVerdun-sur-Garonne, Tarn-et-Garonne
179729.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 183366.1SelectedBishop of Tarbes, France
30 Sep 183366.4ConfirmedBishop of Tarbes, France
29 Nov 183366.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes, France
1 Apr 184476.9DiedBishop of Tarbes, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Michel-Marie Double:
Bishop Pierre-Michel-Marie Double (born , died ) Bishop of Tarbes

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 358

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013