Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Omer Garant

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada

Titular Bishop of Zorolus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1899Born
10 May 192323.8Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
24 Apr 194848.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
24 Apr 194848.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Zorolus
29 Jun 194848.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zorolus
21 Oct 196263.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Charles-Omer Garant
Bishop Charles-Omer Garant (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Québec

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNotre-Dame-de-Lévis

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 75
  • c1: CB, 18 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018