Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Castelli

Deceased

Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1668BornNocera Pagani
22 Sep 169122.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Dec 169123.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 173061.9AppointedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
26 Nov 173061.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
Mar 1733³64.2DiedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Castelli:
Bishop Francesco Castelli (born , died Mar 1733) Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano)

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 264
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015