Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Carnevale

Deceased

Bishop of Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹BornStilio
19 Feb 164636.1AppointedBishop of Isola, Italy
11 Mar 164636.1Ordained BishopBishop of Isola, Italy
12 Dec 164636.9DiedBishop of Isola, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Carnevale:
Bishop Domenico Carnevale (died ) Bishop of Isola

  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 210
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015