Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Merino López, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Valladolid, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1583Born
24 Mar 164662.7SelectedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
18 Feb 164763.6ConfirmedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
24 Sep 166380.2DiedBishop of Valladolid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Merino López
Bishop Juan Merino López O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Valladolid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

Source(s):
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 358
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 177, Number 1,102
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,647, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast