Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Luis Manso Zuņiga

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Burgos

Titular Bishop of Auzia


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Jul 1648AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Burgos, Spain
6 Jul 1648AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
22 Nov 1648³Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzia
16 Dec 1669DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Luis Manso Zuņiga:
Bishop Pedro Luis Manso Zuņiga (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 103
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,575
  • bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 178, Number 1,107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 20 Jan 2014