Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pier Luigi Cardinal Carafa (Sr.)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tricarico

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1581BornNaples
29 Mar 162442.7AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
Apr 162442.7Ordained PriestPriest of Tricarico, Italy
2 Jun 162442.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
15 Jul 162443.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
20 Sep 163453.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
6 Mar 164563.6Elevated to Cardinal
10 Jul 164564.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
8 Jan 164664.5ResignedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
15 Feb 165573.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Tricarico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pier Luigi Carafa (Sr.):
Cardinal Pier Luigi Carafa (Sr.) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tricarico

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
  • a cardinal for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Mar 1645
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 343
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 85, Number 504

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013