Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simeone de Summis, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sapë, Albania


Events

DateEventTitle
27 May 1647AppointedBishop of Sapë, Albania
2 Jun 1647Ordained BishopBishop of Sapë, Albania
Dec 1672²DiedBishop of Sapë, Albania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simeone de Summis
Bishop Simeone de Summis O.F.M. (died Dec 1672) Bishop of Sapë

  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 305
  • ob/c2+: CB, 4 Dec 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1647, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast