Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Teutonico

Deceased

Archbishop of Manfredonia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587¹Born
12 Apr 164962.2AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
18 Apr 164962.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
Nov 1651³64.8DiedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Teutonico
Archbishop Paolo Teutonico (born 1587, died Nov 1651) Archbishop of Manfredonia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNola, Diocese of Nola
Ordained BishopBorghese Chapel, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,836
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 9
  • ob/c2+: AT, 2 Aug 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast