Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis de Fortia-Montréal

Deceased

Bishop of Carpentras, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618¹Born
9 Jun 164628.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Sep 164628.6AppointedBishop of Cavaillon, France
23 Sep 164628.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cavaillon, France
26 Jun 165638.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Carpentras, France
25 May 165739.3SucceededBishop of Carpentras, France
26 Apr 166143.3DiedBishop of Carpentras, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis de Fortia-Montréal
Bishop Louis de Fortia-Montréal (born 1618, died ) Bishop of Carpentras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvignon

  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 136, and Page 143
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast