Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fortino Hipólito Vera y Talonia

Deceased

Bishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1834BornSantiago Tequisquiac
Dec 185723.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 189459.9AppointedBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
29 Jul 189460.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
5 Aug 189460.0InstalledBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
22 Sep 189864.1DiedBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México

MicroData Summary for Fortino Hipólito Vera y Talonia:
Bishop Fortino Hipólito Vera y Talonia (born , died ) Bishop of Cuernavaca

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,971
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013