Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Calza, S.X. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Chengchow [Zhengzhou], China

Titular Bishop of Termessus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1879Born
189717.4ProfessedMember of Xaverian Missionary Fathers
24 May 190222.8Ordained PriestPriest of Xaverian Missionary Fathers
23 Jun 190626.9AppointedPrefect of Western Honan {Ho-Nan Occidentale}, China
18 Sep 191132.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Honan {Ho-Nan Occidentale}, China
18 Sep 191132.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Termessus
12 Apr 191232.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Termessus
27 Oct 194465.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Chengchow [Zhengzhou], China

MicroData Summary for Luigi Calza
Bishop Luigi Calza S.X. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Chengchow [Zhengzhou]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoccaprebalza di Berceto, Italy

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017