Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Maria Berengo

Deceased

Archbishop of Udine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1820BornVenice
5 Feb 184322.6Ordained PriestPriest
31 Dec 187757.5AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
2 Feb 187857.6Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
12 May 187958.8AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
10 Nov 188464.3AppointedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
7 Mar 189675.7DiedArchbishop of Udine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Berengo:
Archbishop Giovanni Maria Berengo (born , died ) Archbishop of Udine

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 78, and Page 364
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 577

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013