Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Garcia de Loaysa Giron

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1534²BornTalavera de la Reina
8 Jul 159864.5AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
16 Aug 159864.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
22 Feb 159965.1DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Garcia de Loaysa Giron:
Archbishop Garcia de Loaysa Giron (died ) Archbishop of Toledo

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,048
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 111, Number 703
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 7 Dec 2013