Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigj Bumci

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}

Titular Bishop of Cantanus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1872BornShkodrŽ
3 May 190330.5Ordained PriestPriest of ShkodrŽ, Albania
18 Sep 191138.9AppointedBishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
10 Dec 191139.1Ordained BishopBishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
1 Sep 194370.8ResignedBishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
1 Sep 194370.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cantanus
1 Mar 194572.3DiedBishop Emeritus of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania

MicroData Summary for Luigj Bumci:
Bishop Luigj Bumci (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1946
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 46
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1911, Number 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013