Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aurelio Briante, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Egitto

Titular Archbishop of Cyrene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1846BornBuja, Italy
25 Jul 186923.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Jul 190458.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Egitto, Egypt
23 Jul 190458.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of
23 Jul 190458.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrene
8 Sep 190458.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cyrene
Feb 1921³74.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Egitto, Egypt
Feb 1921³74.6ResignedApostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of
18 Jul 192983.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Egitto, Egypt

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aurelio Briante:
Archbishop Aurelio Briante O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Egitto

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 151
  • b: Acta Sanctae Sedis, Volume 37, Page 315
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013