Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Piccardo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Titular Bishop of Capharnaum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1845BornVarazze, Italy
19 Mar 187024.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 190256.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
15 Mar 190256.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
20 Apr 190256.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
3 Dec 191772.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Luigi Piccardo:
Bishop Luigi Piccardo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 179
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 110
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013