Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Luigi Piavi (Biavi), O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1833Born
22 Dec 185522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
14 Nov 187643.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Siunia
14 Nov 187643.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Syria
14 Nov 187643.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria
26 Nov 187643.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Siunia
28 Aug 188956.4AppointedPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
24 Jan 190571.8DiedPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Luigi Piavi (Biavi)
Patriarch Luigi Piavi (Biavi) O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRavenna, Archdiocese of Ravenna, Italy
Ordained BishopPropaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 306, and Page 522
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017