Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Erasmus Bertone (Bortoni)

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Eumenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1696Born
11 Apr 171923.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Feb 173034.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Eumenia
25 Mar 173034.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eumenia

MicroData Summary for Erasmus Bertone (Bortoni)
Bishop Erasmus Bertone (Bortoni) (born ) Titular Bishop of Eumenia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuindicio

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 197
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 Aug 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,472
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast