Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pompeo Cornazzano, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Parma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1576¹BornPapien
2 Dec 161539.9AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
8 Dec 161539.9Ordained BishopBishop of Parma, Italy
5 Jul 164771.5DiedBishop of Parma, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pompeo Cornazzano:
Bishop Pompeo Cornazzano O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Parma

  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 275
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 59, Number 336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013