Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Bessone, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Meru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1904BornVigone, Italy
15 Aug 192622.0Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
3 Mar 195449.6AppointedBishop of Meru, Kenya
27 May 195449.8Ordained BishopBishop of Meru, Kenya
7 Apr 197671.7DiedBishop of Meru, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Bessone:
Bishop Lorenzo Bessone I.M.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Meru

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013