Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonello Berti, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Luang Prabang, Laos

Titular Bishop of Germanicopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1925Born
20 Jun 194822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
18 Jun 196236.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vientiane, Laos
18 Jun 196236.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
26 Aug 196236.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
1 Mar 196337.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Luang Prabang, Laos
24 Feb 196842.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Luang Prabang, Laos

MicroData Summary for Leonello Berti
Bishop Leonello Berti O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Luang Prabang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant’Agata-Regello

  • a priest for 19.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast