Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Domenico Cenci, T.C. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Apollonia

Titular See: (Francesco di Loreto)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1829Born
26 Apr 184617.2ProfessedMember of Capuchin Tertiary Religious of Our Lady of Sorrows
20 Dec 185122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Capuchin Tertiary Religious of Our Lady of Sorrows
17 Sep 189465.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
11 Nov 189465.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonia
4 Mar 191081.1DiedTitular Bishop of Apollonia

MicroData Summary for Luigi Domenico Cenci
Bishop Luigi Domenico Cenci T.C. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Apollonia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoreto
Ordained BishopSaint Mary Major, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: MW, 30 May 2011
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 112
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017