Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Coccapani

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584¹BornFerrare
7 Apr 162541.2AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
13 Apr 162541.2Ordained BishopBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
26 Jun 1650³66.4DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Coccapani
Bishop Paolo Coccapani (born 1584, died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,400
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 294
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Jul 2016