Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Raoul de La Guibourgère

Deceased

Bishop of Saintes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹BornAngers
18 Dec 161747.9AppointedBishop of Saintes, France
18 Mar 161848.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saintes, France
14 Sep 163060.7DiedBishop of Saintes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel Raoul de La Guibourgère:
Bishop Michel Raoul de La Guibourgère (born 1570, died ) Bishop of Saintes

  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4304
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1618, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015