Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joel Zamudio Baylon

Bishop of Legazpi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1954 BornMilaor
8 Oct 197824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Legazpi, Philippines
14 Feb 199844.0AppointedBishop of Masbate, Philippines
25 Mar 199844.2Ordained BishopBishop of Masbate, Philippines
1 Oct 200955.7AppointedBishop of Legazpi, Philippines
10 Dec 200955.9InstalledBishop of Legazpi, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Joel Zamudio Baylon:
Bishop Joel Zamudio Baylon (born ) Bishop of Legazpi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Legazpi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013