Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Gianfrancesco Morosini

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1604Born
13 Jun 164439.7AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
4 Sep 164439.9Ordained BishopPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
5 Aug 167873.8DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gianfrancesco Morosini (VIAF: 80677190)
Patriarch Gianfrancesco Morosini (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopS. Croce, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Buried Place (Original)San Nicola da Tolentino, Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 362
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,277
  • c2: AT, 15 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 16 Oct 2018

Quantcast