Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentino Baranowski

Deceased

Bishop of Lublin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1805BornSłowków
1834¹28.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 185752.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
3 Aug 185752.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Loryma
13 Dec 185752.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Loryma
22 Dec 187166.8AppointedBishop of Lublin, Poland
12 Aug 187974.5DiedBishop of Lublin, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Valentino Baranowski:
Bishop Valentino Baranowski (born , died ) Bishop of Lublin

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 349

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 9 Jul 2015