Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Canepa

Deceased

Bishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1853BornCagliari
20 Dec 187926.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cagliari, Italy
18 Feb 190349.6AppointedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
21 May 190349.8Ordained BishopBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
11 Dec 192269.4DiedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy

MicroData Summary for Luca Canepa:
Bishop Luca Canepa (born , died ) Bishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori)

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1923
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 281
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013