Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Saturnino Peri

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Iglesias

Titular Bishop of Ancusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1862BornTresnuraghes
30 Jun 190947.3AppointedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
15 Aug 190947.4Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
16 Dec 192058.7AppointedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
1 Nov 192967.6ResignedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
1 Nov 192967.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ancusa
9 Jan 194582.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Iglesias, Italy

MicroData Summary for Saturnino Peri:
Bishop Saturnino Peri (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Iglesias

  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1946
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015