Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Youssef Abedallah Matta

Archbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1968 Born
19 Jun 199930.5Ordained PriestPriest of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
8 Nov 201849.9SelectedArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
18 Mar 201950.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
1 Jun 201950.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel

MicroData Summary for Youssef Abedallah Matta
Archbishop Youssef Abedallah Matta (born ) Archbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNazareth
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Seminary, Nazareth

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2019
  • ob: CB, 27 Mar 2019
  • mn/c2+: CB, 31 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 2 Jun 2019

Quantcast