Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Badía, O.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

Titular Bishop of Isauropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1807¹Born
1825¹18.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
19 Jan 184235.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China
19 Jan 184235.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Isauropolis
26 Feb 184336.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isauropolis
1 Sep 184437.6DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Badía
Bishop Tomás Badía O.P. (born 1807, died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Feliu de Saserra, Spain

  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 226
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 151, Number 823
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast