Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Garabed (Charles) Aslanian

Deceased

Archbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

Titular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia


Events

DateEventTitle
8 May 1885AppointedBishop of Adana (Armenian), Turkey
24 May 1885Ordained BishopBishop of Adana (Armenian), Turkey
23 Sep 1890ResignedBishop of Adana (Armenian), Turkey
23 Sep 1890AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
23 Sep 1890AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
Jun 1897³DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Garabed (Charles) Aslanian
Archbishop Garabed (Charles) Aslanian (died Jun 1897) Archbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Cilicia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdana
Ordained BishopConstantinople

  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 74, and Page 305
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017