Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Avedis Marcus Turkian

Deceased

Bishop of Alep (Armenian), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1845Born
23 Sep 189045.1AppointedBishop of Marasc (Armenian), Turkey
16 Nov 189045.3Ordained BishopBishop of Marasc (Armenian), Turkey
6 Feb 189953.5AppointedBishop of Alep (Armenian), Syria
20 Aug 190055.0DiedBishop of Alep (Armenian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Avedis Marcus Turkian
Bishop Avedis Marcus Turkian (born , died ) Bishop of Alep

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeit-Eddin
Ordained BishopIstanbul

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 364, and Page 87
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1890, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017